EP0072328 - Bogie with orientatable wheel axles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.04.1986 [1986/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE M T E Société anonyme 32, Quai de Dion Bouton F-92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states SOCIETE M T E Société anonyme 32, Quai de Dion Bouton F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states CREUSOT-LOIRE 42 rue d'Anjou F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bevand, Jacques 12 B rue du Villet F-71200 Le Creusot / FR | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Lejet, Christian Société JEUMONT-SCHNEIDER 31-32, Quai de Dion Bouton F-92811 Puteaux Cedex / FR | [1985/14] |
Former [1983/07] | Saint Martin, René CREUSOT-LOIRE 15 rue Pasquier F-75383 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401490.6 | 06.08.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | FR19810015422 | 07.08.1981 Original published format: FR 8115422 | [1983/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072328 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072328 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/44, B61F5/30 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
B61F5/44 (EP,US);
B61F3/04 (EP,US);
B61F5/305 (EP,US);
B61F5/38 (EP,US);
B61F5/386 (EP,US);
B61F5/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/07] | Title | German: | Drehgestell mit lenkbaren Achsen | [1983/07] | English: | Bogie with orientatable wheel axles | [1983/07] | French: | Bogie à essieux orientables | [1983/07] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 07.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2624719 (SCHWEIZERISCHE LOKOMOTIV); | [Y]CH324972 (SCHWEIZERISCHE LOKOMOTIV [CH]); | [A]DE942932 (METALLGUMMI GMBH); | [A]DE749979 ; | [A]CH183368 (V R L INTERNATIONALE GES ZUR A [CH]) |