EP0072334 - Method and system for transporting live sea animals such as shell fish [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Martin, Alain La Croix Neuve F-29228 Plougasnou / FR | [1983/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/07] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401526.7 | 12.08.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | FR19810015598 | 12.08.1981 Original published format: FR 8115598 | [1983/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072334 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072334 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/04, A01K63/00 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
F25D17/042 (EP);
A01K63/02 (EP,US);
A01K63/00 (EP);
B60P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Lebendtransport von Wassertieren wie z.B. Krebstiere | [1983/07] | English: | Method and system for transporting live sea animals such as shell fish | [1983/07] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la conservation en vie d'animaux aquatiques tels que des crustacés pendant leur transport | [1983/07] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/42] | 29.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE160966 ; | [A]FR419739 (HENRI SCIOT [FR]); | [A]US2751882 (COYNER JAMES M); | [A]US3687111 (EPPER KARL F) |