EP0072758 - Gelled edible composition of firm consistency for a bakery product with prolonged conservation, and process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.1987 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NABISCO BRANDS, Inc. Nabisco Brands Plaza Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states NABISCO BRANDS, Inc. Nabisco Brands Plaza Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | ||
Former [1984/03] | For all designated states NABISCO BRANDS, INC. Nabisco Brands Plaza Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | ||
Former [1983/08] | For all designated states NABISCO BRANDS, Inc. Nabisco Brands Plaza Parsippany New Jersey 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanderveer, Fred 61 Glenmere Terrace Mahwah New Jersey 07430 / US | 02 /
Knipper, Aloysius J. 227 Cupsaw Drive Ringwood New Jersey 07456 / US | 03 /
Straka, Robert 2 Reynolds Road Pequannock New Jersey 07440 / US | 04 /
Squicciarini, Alex J. 40-18 Brookside Avenue Fairlawn New Jersey 07410 / US | [1983/08] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian, et al Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/08] | Bonnetat, Christian, et al CABINET BONNETAT 23, Rue de St. Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401534.1 | 13.08.1982 | [1983/08] | Priority number, date | US19810293924 | 18.08.1981 Original published format: US 293924 | [1983/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072758 | Date: | 23.02.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072758 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/04, A21D13/08 | [1983/08] | CPC: |
A21D2/18 (EP,US);
A21D13/80 (EP,US);
A21D2/183 (EP,US);
A23L29/256 (EP,US);
A23L29/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/08] | Title | German: | Essbare gelierte Zusammensetzung von fester Konsistenz für ein Bäckereiprodukt mit verlängerter Konservierung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1983/08] | English: | Gelled edible composition of firm consistency for a bakery product with prolonged conservation, and process for its manufacture | [1983/08] | French: | Composition comestible gélifiée de consistance ferme pour produit de boulangerie à conservation prolongée et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1983/08] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/12] | 05.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3119697 (LEO ALBERT J, et al); | [AD]US3493382 (RYAN JOHN W, et al); | [A]FR2241183 (KELCO CO [US]); | [A]US3892871 (COOPER NED); | [A]DE2420622 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [A]FR2274222 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) |