EP0076713 - Aminomethyl-1H-indole-4-methanol derivatives and their salts, process and intermediates for their preparation, their use as medicines and compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROUSSEL-UCLAF 35, Boulevard des Invalides 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/15] | For all designated states ROUSSEL-UCLAF 35, Boulevard des Invalides F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillaume, Jacques 15, Avenue du Belvédère Apt. 1904 F-93310 Le Pré-Saint-Gervais / FR | 02 /
Nedelec, Lucien 45, boulevard de l'Ouest F-93340 Le Raincy / FR | 03 /
Plassard, Guy 6, rue Clément Marot F-91600 Savigny-sur-Orge / FR | 04 /
Brown, Neil Leslie 12, rue Jaucourt F-75012 Paris / FR | [1986/01] |
Former [1983/15] | 01 /
Guillaume, Jacques 15, Avenue du Belvédère Apt. 1904 F-93310 Le Pré-Saint-Gervais / FR | ||
02 /
Nedelec, Lucien 45, boulevard de l'Ouest F-93340 Le Raincy / FR | |||
03 /
Plassard, Guy 6, rue Clément Marot F-91600 Savigny-Sur-Orge / FR | |||
04 /
Brown, Neil Leslie 12, rue Jaucourt F-75012 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Bourgouin, André, et al Département des Brevets ROUSSEL UCLAF 111 Route de Noisy B.P. 9 93230 Romainville / FR | [2008/34] |
Former [1983/15] | Bourgouin, André, et al Département des Brevets ROUSSEL UCLAF B.P. no 9 F-93230 Romainville / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401660.4 | 13.09.1982 | [1983/15] | Priority number, date | FR19810017560 | 17.09.1981 Original published format: FR 8117560 | [1983/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0076713 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0076713 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/08, A61K31/40 | [1983/15] | CPC: |
C07D209/08 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07F7/1804 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/15] | Title | German: | Aminomethyl 1H-Indole 4-Methanol Derivate und ihre Salze, Verfahren und Zwischenprodukte zu ihren Herstellung, Verwendung als Heilmittel und Zusammenstellungen die sie enthalten | [1983/15] | English: | Aminomethyl-1H-indole-4-methanol derivatives and their salts, process and intermediates for their preparation, their use as medicines and compositions containing them | [1983/15] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés de l'aminométhyl 1H-indole 4-méthanol et leurs sels, leur procédé et les intermédiaires de préparation, leur application à titre de médicaments, les compositions les renfermant | [1983/15] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/37] | 11.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.06.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1532210 (ICI LTD); | [Y]FR2332010 (CONTINENTAL PHARMA [BE]) | [X] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, vol. 51, no. 7, 31 octobre 1968, pages 1616-1628 | [A] - HOUBEN-WEYL: "Methoden der organischen Chemie", Band XI/1, 1957, Georg Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart, DE. | Examination | - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, vol. 51, no. 7, 31 octobre 1968, pages 1616-1628, F. TROXLER et al.: "Synthesen von Indolen mit (2-Aminoäthyl)-, (2-Aminopropyl)- oder Alkanolamin-Seitenketten am Sechsring" |