EP0077236 - Mounting of blades in segments on a rotor disc of a turbo machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lardellier, Alain M.J. 1, rue Augereau F-77000 Melun / FR | [1983/16] | Representative(s) | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 91003 Evry Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/16] | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401746.1 | 28.09.1982 | [1983/16] | Priority number, date | FR19810019001 | 09.10.1981 Original published format: FR 8119001 | [1983/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077236 | Date: | 20.04.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30 | [1983/16] | CPC: |
F01D5/3046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/16] | Title | German: | Befestigung von Schaufelsektoren auf einer Rotorscheibe einer Turbomaschine | [1983/16] | English: | Mounting of blades in segments on a rotor disc of a turbo machine | [1983/16] | French: | Dispositif d'implantation d'aubes en secteurs sur un disque de rotor de turbomachine | [1983/16] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 08.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/16] | 01.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2001708 ; | [A]FR634020 ; | [A]FR519206 ; | [A]FR1053118 ; | [A]FR345730 ; | [A]US1876067 ; | [A]FR336322 ; | [A]GB2001398 ; | [A]US3393894 |