EP0079826 - Article of furniture which can be manually assembled and dismantled [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.1986 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.1986 [1986/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pigeon, Daniel 27, rue Drouot 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | For all designated states Pigeon, Daniel 27, rue Drouot F-75009 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/21] | Representative(s) | Thibon-Littaye, Annick Cabinet A. THIBON-LITTAYE 11, Rue de l'Etang 78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | Thibon-Littaye, Annick Cabinet A. THIBON-LITTAYE 11 rue de l'Etang F-78160 Marly-le-Roi / FR | Application number, filing date | 82402053.1 | 09.11.1982 | [1983/21] | Priority number, date | FR19810021225 | 13.11.1981 Original published format: FR 8121225 | [1983/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0079826 | Date: | 25.05.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A47B47/04, F16B12/46 | [1983/21] | CPC: |
A47B47/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/21] | Title | German: | Manuell zusammensetzbares und zerlegbares Möbelstück | [1983/21] | English: | Article of furniture which can be manually assembled and dismantled | [1983/21] | French: | Meuble assemblable et démontable manuellement | [1983/21] | File destroyed: | 04.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 21.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/04] | 24.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.06.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/49] | 07.07.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2432642 ; | [Y]FR2297311 ; | [A]FR2088605 ; | [A]FR1325425 ; | [A]FR1561562 |