Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] |
21.11.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.01.1987 [1987/02] |
30.01.1985 | Change - representative | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] |
20.06.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.08.1984 [1984/34] |
08.11.1983 | Publication of search report | published on 11.01.1984 [1984/02] |
22.04.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.06.1983 [1983/25] |