EP0082075 - Method and tool for manufacturing a fuel assembly for a light water nuclear reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1987 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1987 [1987/22] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
IT
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération, Boîte Postale 150 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
IT
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | |||
Former [1983/25] | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
IT
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states FRAMATOME ET CIE. Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Pargneux, Jacques 125, Rue Duguesclin F-69006 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Bonnamour, Michel 3,rue de Champagneux F-69008 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Filary, Gérard 9, Résidence des Quinconces F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1983/25] | Application number, filing date | 82402256.0 | 09.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | FR19810023286 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: FR 8123286 | [1983/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082075 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082075 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/32 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
B25B27/026 (EP,US);
G21C3/32 (KR);
G21C3/334 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US);
Y10S29/048 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49874 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Werkzeug zur Herstellung eines Brennelementbündels für einen Leichtwasserkernreaktor | [1983/25] | English: | Method and tool for manufacturing a fuel assembly for a light water nuclear reactor | [1983/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un assemblage combustible de réacteur nucléaire du type à eau légère et outillage pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1983/25] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 10.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3352003 (MURTHA BRUCE E); | [A]GB1101142 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [A]FR2171279 (TRANSFER SYSTEMS [US]); | [A]US3791466 (PATTERSON J, et al); | [A]US4292130 (VIAUD JEAN-LUC, et al) |