EP0073728 - Detachable locking mechanism for nuclear reactor fuel bundles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1986 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1986 [1986/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states URANIUM PECHINEY 23 bis rue Balzac 75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/24] | For all designated states URANIUM PECHINEY 23 bis rue Balzac F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | ||
Former [1983/10] | For all designated states URANIUM PECHINEY UGINE KUHLMANN 23 rue Balzac B.P. 787 08 F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blum, Jacques 5, rue Voltaire F-92300 Levallois / FR | [1983/10] | Representative(s) | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [1983/10] | Givord, Jean-Pierre PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 82420122.2 | 25.08.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | FR19810016605 | 26.08.1981 Original published format: FR 8116605 | [1983/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073728 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073728 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21C5/06, G21C3/32, F16L37/00 | [1983/10] | CPC: |
G21C3/334 (EP);
G21C3/33 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/10] | Title | German: | Demontierbare Verbindungsvorrichtung für Brennelementbündel eines Kernreaktors | [1983/10] | English: | Detachable locking mechanism for nuclear reactor fuel bundles | [1983/10] | French: | Dispositif de jonction démontable pour assemblage combustible pour réacteur nucléaire | [1983/10] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/22] | 26.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB907535 (THOMPSON NUCLEAR ENERGY CO LTD); | [Y]FR1392932 (SOC ANGLO BELGE VULCAIN SA); | [Y]FR1452399 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [AD]US3349004 (LASS JAMES L, et al); | [A]US3769158 (WINDERS G); | [A]FR2276494 (CITROEN SA [FR]); | [A]FR2341917 (EXXON NUCLEAR CO INC [US]); | [A]US4219386 (FLORA BARNEY S [US], et al) |