EP0083549 - Calorifically highly efficient rotary furnace for producing burned gypsum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TALLERES A. MONTERDE, S.A. calle Ramon y Cajal s/n Molins De Rei (Barcelona) / ES | [1983/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monterde, Irene V. Calle Ramon y Cajal s/n Molins de Rei (Barcelona) / ES | [1983/28] | Representative(s) | Marek, Pierre Cabinet Marek 28, rue de la Loge 13235 Marseille Cédex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/28] | Marek, Pierre 32, rue de la Loge F-13002 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 82430041.2 | 21.12.1982 | [1983/28] | Priority number, date | ES19810508264 | 22.12.1981 Original published format: ES 508264 | [1983/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083549 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083549 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F27B7/00, C04B11/02 | [1983/28] | CPC: |
C04B11/036 (EP);
F27B7/04 (EP);
F27B7/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B11/036, C04B11/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/28] | Title | German: | Drehrohrofen zum Brennen von Gips mit hoher Wärmeleistung | [1983/28] | English: | Calorifically highly efficient rotary furnace for producing burned gypsum | [1983/28] | French: | Four rotatif à haut rendement calorifique, pour la fabrication de plâtres | [1983/28] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/11] | 07.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2207987 (WETHERALD KENT DONALD, et al); | [Y]FR1212037 ; | [Y]DE1106237 (FELLNER & ZIEGLER GMBH); | [A]FR1292406 ; | [Y]FR1353434 ; | [A]BE656801 ; | [A]FR2113045 (BABCOCK & WILCOX AG) |