EP0067112 - Flyer winder for externally slotted dynamoelectric machine core member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1986 [1986/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WINDAMATIC SYSTEMS, Inc. 1025 Goshen Rd. P.O. Box 10071 Fort Wayne Indiana 46850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | For all designated states WINDAMATIC SYSTEMS, Inc. 1025 Goshen Rd. P.O. Box 10071 Fort Wayne Indiana 46850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eminger, Robert J. 7120 Melody Lane Fort Wayne Indiana 46804 / US | [1982/50] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1982/50] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 82630050.1 | 07.05.1982 | [1982/50] | Priority number, date | US19810265657 | 20.05.1981 Original published format: US 265657 | [1982/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067112 | Date: | 15.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067112 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/09 | [1982/50] | CPC: |
H02K15/085 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/50] | Title | German: | Wickelmaschine mit beweglichem Arm für ein Kernelement mit Aussennuten einer dynamo-elektrischen Maschine | [1982/50] | English: | Flyer winder for externally slotted dynamoelectric machine core member | [1982/50] | French: | Bobineuse à bras mobile pour un élément de noyau à encoches extérieures d'une machine dynamo-électrique | [1982/50] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/13] | 20.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55037821 ; | [A]JP55071156 ; | [Y]FR742690 ; | [Y]GB1183552 (ELEKTROMAT VEB [DE]); | [A]GB810112 (MIDLAND DYNAMO COMPANY LTD); | [A]CH412084 (MEZ BRNO NARODNI PODNIK [CZ]) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 67(E-11)[549], 20th May 1980, page 150E11; & JP-A-55 037 821 (HITACHI) 17-03-1980, & JP55037821 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 112(E-21)[594], 12th August 1980, page 159E21; & JP-A-55 071 156 (HITACHI) 29-05-1980, & JP55071156 A 00000000 |