EP0082100 - Single crystal articles having controlled secondary crystallographic orientation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gemma, Anthony Enrico 34 Miles Avenue Middletown Connecticut 06457 / US | 02 /
Dierberger, James Albert 144 Blackman Road Hebron Connecticut 06248 / US | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 82630112.9 | 07.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810330757 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: US 330757 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0082100 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0082100 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082100 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C30B11/14, C30B29/52, B22D27/04 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
C30B11/14 (EP,US);
C30B11/00 (EP,US);
C30B29/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/25] | C30B11/14, C30B29/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/25] | Title | German: | Einkristallgegenstände mit kontrollierter sekundärer Kristallorientierung | [1983/25] | English: | Single crystal articles having controlled secondary crystallographic orientation | [1983/25] | French: | Articles monocristallins avec orientation cristallographique secondaire contrôlée | [1983/25] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/51] | 03.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2010570 ; | [A]US3536121 (PIEARCEY BARRY J) | Examination | US3494709 | US3572419 |