Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1990 [1990/47] |
21.10.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.12.1989 [1989/49] |
02.07.1987 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 19.08.1987 [1987/34] |
23.09.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.11.1982 [1982/47] |
16.07.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.09.1982 [1982/37] |