Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE48419T | 15.12.1989 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | EP82810097 | 04.03.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0060222 | Global Dossier | 06.12.1989 | B1 | EP0060222 | 15.09.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1180018 | 27.12.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3280049D1 | 11.01.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU189567 | 28.07.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU198191 | 28.08.1989 | B | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL65191 | 31.07.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0250905B | 05.11.1990 | B2 | JPS57159773 | 01.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | CH162281 | 10.03.1981 | Type | Divisional application | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 19.08.1985 |