EP0063543 - Timepiece with control mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBAUCHES ELECTRONIQUES S.A. CH-2074 Marin / CH | [1982/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cleusix, Willy Chemin Mol 63 CH-2525 Le Landeron / CH | [1982/43] | Representative(s) | Barbeaux, Bernard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/43] | Barbeaux, Bernard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 82810149.3 | 06.04.1982 | [1982/43] | Priority number, date | CH19810002564 | 16.04.1981 Original published format: CH 256481 | [1982/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063543 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G04B27/04, G04B29/02, G04B19/24 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
G04B19/25 (EP,US);
G04B27/04 (EP,US);
G04B29/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/43] | Title | German: | Uhr mit Steuermechanismus | [1982/43] | English: | Timepiece with control mechanism | [1982/43] | French: | Pièce d'horlogerie à mécanisme de commande | [1982/43] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/43] | 28.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1985/51] | 06.07.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]CH130727 (PERREGAUX RENE [CH], et al); | [A]CH132961 (MAMBRETTI MANLIO [CH]); | [Y]DE1988992U (STAIGER FEINMECH [DE]); | [A]US3735581 (FLUCK J, et al) |