EP0066536 - Wrist watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/49] | Watch case | ||
[1986/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montres Rado S.A. Bielstrasse 43 2543 Lengnau b. Biel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1982/49] | For all designated states Montres Rado S.A. Bielstrasse 43 CH-2543 Lengnau b. Biel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gogniat, Paul Chemin de la Prévôté 14 CH-2504 Bienne / CH | [1982/49] | Representative(s) | Gresset, Jean, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Gresset, Jean, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [1982/49] | Klein, André Gilbert Société Générale de l'Horlogerie Suisse S.A. ASUAG 6, Faubourg du Lac CH-2501 Biel/Bienne / CH | Application number, filing date | 82810208.7 | 17.05.1982 | [1982/49] | Priority number, date | CH19810003405 | 25.05.1981 Original published format: CH 340581 | [1982/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0066536 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0066536 | Date: | 01.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/16, A44C5/14 | [1982/49] | CPC: |
G04B37/1486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1982/49] | Title | German: | Armbanduhr | [1986/40] | English: | Wrist watch | [1986/40] | French: | Montre-bracelet | [1986/40] |
Former [1982/49] | Uhrgehäuse | ||
Former [1982/49] | Watch case | ||
Former [1982/49] | Boîte de montre | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 17.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.10.1986 | CH | 31.05.1987 | LI | 31.05.1987 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 01.10.1986 | |
CH | 31.05.1987 | ||
LI | 31.05.1987 | ||
Former [1989/24] | CH | 31.05.1987 | |
LI | 31.05.1987 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH486860 ; | [Y]US1760384 (TOST CHARLES R); | [Y]GB412883 (FRIEDRICH SPEIDEL); | [X]US2505044 (HEINRICH WALTER A); | [A]US3554414 (GLUCK LOUIS, et al); | [A]US3795353 (WEISS I); | [A]FR2398333 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [Y]GB1565378 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) |