EP0069705 - Synergistic agent and process for the selective control of weeds, especially in crops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1986 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/02] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quadranti, Marco, Dr. Promenade 24 CH-5200 Brugg / CH | 02 /
Maag, Kurt Krebsenbachweg 18 CH-4148 Pfeffingen / CH | [1983/02] | Application number, filing date | 82810283.0 | 02.07.1982 | [1983/02] | Priority number, date | CH19810004485 | 08.07.1981 Original published format: CH 448581 | [1983/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069705 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069705 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/30, // (A01N47/30, 43:84, 47:30, 43:64, 47:30, 43:56, 47:30, 43:40) | [1983/02] | CPC: |
A01N47/30 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/30, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/30, A01N43/84, A01N47/30, A01N43/64, A01N47/30, A01N43/56, A01N47/30, A01N43/40 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/02] | Title | German: | Synergistisches Mittel und Verfahren zur selektiven Unkrautbekämpfung, insbesondere in Getreide | [1983/02] | English: | Synergistic agent and process for the selective control of weeds, especially in crops | [1983/02] | French: | Agent synergistique et procédé pour combattre sélectivement des mauvaises herbes, en particulier dans les récoltes | [1983/02] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1982 | Examination requested [1983/02] | 15.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0000414 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]FR2430941 (KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP]); | [PD]EP0043802 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |