EP0073744 - Medical and sporting training apparatus for the joints, the heart and the blood circulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1984 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.1984 [1984/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer, Ernst Erlenweg 13 CH-4528 Zuchwil / CH | [1983/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/10] | Application number, filing date | 82810362.2 | 01.09.1982 | [1983/10] | Priority number, date | CH19810005606 | 01.09.1981 Original published format: CH 560681 | [1983/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073744 | Date: | 09.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/04, A63B21/00 | [1983/10] | CPC: |
A63B21/0083 (EP);
A63B21/00069 (EP);
A63B21/4047 (EP);
A63B22/0056 (EP);
A63B2208/0204 (EP);
A63B2208/0233 (EP);
A63B2225/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/10] | Title | German: | Gelenk, Herz- und Kreislauftrainingsgerät für Medizin und Sport | [1983/10] | English: | Medical and sporting training apparatus for the joints, the heart and the blood circulation | [1983/10] | French: | Appareil d'entraînement médical et sportif pour les articulations, le coeur et la circulation | [1983/10] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/20] | 17.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3758112 ; | [X]DE2428515 ; | [X]GB2031742 ; | [Y]US3741540 ; | [Y]US3128094 ; | [A]US3529474 ; | [A]FR2002808 ; | [A]CH446148 |