EP0074928 - Reactive dyestuffs, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/12] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheibli, Peter, Dr. Nussbaumweg 3 CH-4103 Bottmingen / CH | 02 /
Seiler, Herbert, Dr. Leimgrubenweg 60 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1983/12] | Application number, filing date | 82810379.6 | 10.09.1982 | [1983/12] | Priority number, date | CH19810005976 | 16.09.1981 Original published format: CH 597681 | [1983/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0074928 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0074928 | Date: | 20.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09B62/04, C09B62/503, D06P3/10, D06P3/66 | [1983/12] | CPC: |
C09B62/4403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/12] | Title | German: | Reaktivfarbstoffe, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1983/12] | English: | Reactive dyestuffs, their preparation and their use | [1983/12] | French: | Colorants réactifs, leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1983/12] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/12] | 25.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2346418 |