EP0084292 - N,N-disubstituted alkenamides and phenylalkenamides, processes for their production and their use as pharmaceuticals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.1985 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1986 [1986/08] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nadelson, Jeffrey 12 Benedict Crescent Denville, N.J., 07834 / US | [1983/30] | Application number, filing date | 82810533.8 | 09.12.1982 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | US19810330601 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: US 330601 | [1983/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084292 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084292 | Date: | 13.02.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/68, C07D295/12, A61K31/16, A61K31/445, A61K31/535 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
C07D295/13 (EP,US);
C07D261/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/30] | Title | German: | N,N,Disubstituierte Alkenamide und Phenylaldenamide, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als Pharmazeutika | [1983/30] | English: | N,N-disubstituted alkenamides and phenylalkenamides, processes for their production and their use as pharmaceuticals | [1983/30] | French: | Phénylalcénamides et alcénamides, procédés pour leur préparation et leur utilisation comme agents pharmaceutiques | [1983/30] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 14.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0038298 (SANDOZ AG [CH]) | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 79, no. 25, 24 December 1973, Columbus, Ohio, USA M. FLAMMANG et al. "Esters and amides of substituted beta-phenoxycinnamic acids. Synthesis and pharmacological studies", page 293, column 1, Abstract no. 146118x | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 83, no. 23, 8 December 1975, Columbus, Ohio, USA S. TANAKA et al. "Cinnamic acid amides and their salts", page 418, column 1, Abstract no. 192858 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts vol. 49, no. 6, 25 March 1955, Columbus, Ohio, USA G. SHAW et al. "Isoxazolinones. VI. The hydrogenation of 5-aminoisoxazoles. A new synthesis of pyrimidines", column 2, Abstracts no. 3978g & J. Chem. Soc., 1954, pages 665-668 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 49, no. 14, 25 July 1955, Columbus, Ohio, USA F.J. VILLANI et al. "Amides of ethylenediamines. II. Substituted cinnamamides as local anesthetic agents", column 2, Abstracts no. 9564f & J. Am. Chem. Soc., vol 76, 1954, pages 87-88 | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 49, no. 6, 25 March 1955, Columbus, Ohio (USA); G.SHAW et al.: "Isoxazolinones. VI. The hydrogenation of 5-aminoisoxazoles. A new synthesis of pyrimidines", column 2, abstract 3978g |