EP0082116 - Method for the delignification of wood and other lignocellulosic products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1986 [1986/42] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
FR
GB
LI
SE
AT
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE 7 route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | For:IT
HYDROCEL s.r.l. Via Ravenna 688 I-44100 Ferrara / IT | [1985/41] |
Former [1983/25] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE 7 route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tournier, Hervé "Le Riondet" F-74520 Valleriy / FR | 02 /
Johansson, Allan 13, rue des Lattes CH-1217 Meyrin / CH | 03 /
Sachetto, Jean-Pierre L'Escalade Rue de Savoie 3 F-74160 Saint-Julien-en-Genevois / FR | 04 /
Armanet, Jean-Michel 8 rue des Bossons CH-1213 Onex / CH | 05 /
Michel, Jean-Pierre 18 Domaine de la Prasle F-74160 Collonges sous Salève / FR | 06 /
Roman, Alain Les Ecureuils No. 6 F-74160 Bossey / FR | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Dousse, Blasco, et al 73, Avenue de Mategin 1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Dousse, Blasco, et al 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 82810536.1 | 09.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810329360 | 10.12.1981 Original published format: US 329360 | [1983/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082116 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082116 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D21C3/00, C21C1/04, D21C11/00 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
D21C3/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Delignifizierung von Holz und anderen Lignozelluloseprodukten | [1983/25] | English: | Method for the delignification of wood and other lignocellulosic products | [1983/25] | French: | Procédé pour délignifier le bois et autres produits lignocellulosiques | [1983/25] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 13.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH237790 (PHRIX ARBEITSGEMEINSCHAFT [DE]); | [Y]US2539093 (HENRI MAINGUET); | [Y]US3215588 (KLEINERT THEODOR N); | [Y]AT336992B (VISCH KHIM T I NIS [BG]); | [XPD]EP0043342 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]); | [YP]EP0054015 (SIMMERING GRAZ PAUKER AG [AT]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 12, 23 mars 1981, page 107, colonne de gauche, no. 85954c, Columbus Ohio (USA); |