EP0083907 - Process for the preparation of pigmented or coloured compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwahlen, Günther Landskronstrasse 12 CH-4143 Dornach / CH | [1983/29] | Application number, filing date | 82810550.2 | 17.12.1982 | [1983/29] | Priority number, date | CH19810008252 | 23.12.1981 Original published format: CH 825281 | [1983/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083907 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/20 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
C08J3/226 (EP);
C08J3/21 (EP);
C08J2377/00 (EP);
C08J2477/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pigment- bzw. Farbstoffpräparaten | [1983/29] | English: | Process for the preparation of pigmented or coloured compositions | [1983/29] | French: | Procédé de préparation de compositions pigmentées ou colorées | [1983/29] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/29] | 08.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.04.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/46] | 20.05.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CS117740 ; | [Y]GB924001 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 66, 1967, Seite 1146, Nr. 11577g, Columbus, Ohio, USA & CS - A - 117 740 (J. TRUBAC) 15.03.1966, & CS117740 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 66, 1967, Seite 2813, Nr. 29230y, Columbus, Ohio, USA |