|
18.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1989 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1989 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1989 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1989 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.01.1989 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.01.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.1988 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1988 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.08.1988 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.07.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.1988 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.05.1988 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.1988 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.1988 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
15.04.1988 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.04.1988 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1988 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.1988 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.02.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.12.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.1987 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1987 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1987 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1987 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.07.1987 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.04.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.03.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.02.1987 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.12.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1986 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.05.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.05.1986 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.05.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.05.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.1985 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.1985 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.1984 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.11.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1982 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.1982 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.1982 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1982 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1982 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
01.02.1982 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |