Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0058644
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.03.2010 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
12.06.2009 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
06.06.2008 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
04.02.1989 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] |
04.07.1988 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] |
04.07.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] |
09.06.1986 |
Opposition filed |
published on 30.07.1986 [1986/31] |
28.05.1986 |
Opposition filed |
published on 16.07.1986 [1986/29] |
29.06.1985 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.08.1985 [1985/35] |
03.02.1983 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.04.1983 [1983/14] |
25.06.1982 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.08.1982 [1982/34] |