Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE15153T | 15.09.1985 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP82830020 | 01.02.1982 | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1144825 | 29.10.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6033538B | 03.08.1985 | B2 | JPS57150440 | 17.09.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX155748 | 25.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | MX991782 | 11.02.1982 | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0058644 | Global Dossier | 22.03.1989 | B2 | EP0058644 | 28.08.1985 | B1 | EP0058644 | 25.08.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8200738 | 21.12.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1160203 | 10.01.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3265693D1 | 03.10.1985 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK160744C | 30.09.1991 | C | DK160744B | 15.04.1991 | B | DK58882 | 13.08.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8302479 | 01.02.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN156084 | 11.05.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4377491 | 22.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | IT1968981 | 12.02.1981 | IT6812681 | 17.08.1981 |