EP0063106 - Process for preparing high purity ursodeoxycholic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERREGIERRE S.p.A. Via Montenapoleone, 27/E I-21021 Milan / IT | [1982/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonaldi, Antonio Via Anna Frank 4 Chiuduno (BG) / IT | 02 /
Molinari, Egidio Via Manzoni Longone al Segrino (CO) / IT | [1982/42] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1985/04] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al Studio Brevetti e Marchi NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.r.l. 33, Viale Bianca Maria I-20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1982/42] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl 33, Viale Bianca Maria I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 82830083.0 | 05.04.1982 | [1982/42] | Priority number, date | IT19810021137 | 14.04.1981 Original published format: IT 2113781 | [1982/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063106 | Date: | 20.10.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063106 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | C07J9/00, C07J51/00 | [1982/42] | CPC: |
C07J51/00 (EP,US);
C07J9/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ursodeoxycholsäure hoher Reinheit | [1982/42] | English: | Process for preparing high purity ursodeoxycholic acid | [1982/42] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'acide ursodéoxymycholique de haute pureté | [1982/42] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/26] | 22.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP7488856 ; | [Y]JP7451259 ; | [Y]GB2036749 (ROUSSEL UCLAF); | [Y]EP0024292 (BLASINACHIM SPA [IT]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.82, no.19, May 12, 1975, page 576, abstract no. 125527b, Columbus, Ohio (US) & JP - A - 74 88 856 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.) (August 24, 1974), & JP7488856 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol.81, no.19, November 11, 1974, page 565, abstract no.120870c, Columbus, Ohio (US) & JP - A - 74 51 259 (TOKYO TANABE CO., LTD) (May 18, 1974), & JP7451259 A 00000000 | Examination | - ACTA CHEMICA SCANDINAVICA, vol.14, no.1, 1960, Copenhagen (DK) B. SAMUELSSON: "Preparation of Ursodeoxycholic acid and 3 alpha, 7 beta, 12 alpha-trihydroxycholanicacid" pages 17-20 |