EP0060819 - A method of manufacturing a fabric having soil-release properties, particularly forming fabrics used in papermaking machines and cellulose machines, and filter cloths used in the papermaking and cellulose industries and related industries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.12.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDISKAFILT AB Gamletullsgatan 3 S-302 44 Halmstad / SE | [1982/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löfgren, Per-Ake Pilgatan 14 S-310 41 Gullbrandstorp / SE | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Ryrlén, J. Evert, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | [1982/38] | Application number, filing date | 82850030.6 | 19.02.1982 | [1982/38] | Priority number, date | SE19810001413 | 05.03.1981 Original published format: SE 8101413 | [1982/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060819 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060819 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D01F1/10, D01F6/92 | [1982/38] | CPC: |
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
D01F1/10 (EP,US);
Y10S162/903 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2025 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2279 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schmutzabweisenden Geweben, insbesondere von Geweben, die bei Papier- und Zellstoffmaschinen verwendet werden, und von Filtertüchern für die Papier- und Zellstoffindustrie und anverwandte Industrien | [1984/48] | English: | A method of manufacturing a fabric having soil-release properties, particularly forming fabrics used in papermaking machines and cellulose machines, and filter cloths used in the papermaking and cellulose industries and related industries | [1982/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de tissus, ne retenant pas les saletés, en particulier de tissus utilisés dans les machines de fabrication du papier et de la cellulose, et de tissus filtrants utilisés dans l'industrie du papier et de la cellulose et dans des industries apparentées | [1982/38] |
Former [1982/38] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schmutzdurchlässigen Geweben, insbesondere von Geweben, die bei Papier- und Zellstoffmaschinen verwendet werden, und von Filtertüchern für die Papier- und Zellstoffindustrie und anverwandte Industrien | Examination procedure | 16.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/21] | 01.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.1985
30.09.1985
ADMISSIBLE Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.1985
30.09.1985
ADMISSIBLE Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | 01.10.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.02.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.03.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 16.05.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.08.1986 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.09.1986 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1987/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [1989/22] | CH | 28.11.1984 | |
LI | 28.11.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP52074020 ; | [A]FR2313493 (STEVENS & CO INC J P [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 111, September 26, 1977, page 2617 C 77; & JP-A-52 074 020 (TEIJIN K.K.) (June 21, 1977), & JP52074020 A 00000000 |