EP0106004 - Method of forming a hydrophilic coating on a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 06.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astra Tech Aktiebolag Box 14 431 21 Mölndal / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states Astra Tech Aktiebolag Box 14 S-431 21 Mölndal / SE | ||
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states Astra Meditec AB Box 14 S-431 21 Mölndal / SE | ||
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states International Silicone Corporation 8615 Commerce Avenue San Diego California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winn, R. Alastair 416 Samarkand Drive Santa Barbara California 93105 / US | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Linderoth, Margareta, et al AstraZenaca AB Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Linderoth, Margareta, et al AB Astra Patent Department S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [1985/23] | Näsman, Rune B. G. AB Astra Patent and Trade Mark Department S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [1984/17] | Wurm, Bengt Runio Patent and Trade Mark Department AB ASTRA S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 82850200.5 | 14.10.1982 | [1984/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106004 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106004 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61F2/00, A61L15/03, A61L17/00, C08G18/62, C09D3/72, C09D3/727, B05D1/36, B05D7/26, B05D7/02, C08J7/04 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L33/0088 (EP,US);
A61L33/064 (EP,US);
A61L33/066 (EP,US);
B05D7/02 (EP,US);
C08G18/6283 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/056 (EP,US);
C08J7/12 (EP,US);
C09K3/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/544 (EP,US);
C08J2439/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31573 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31576 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3158 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/085, C08L39/08, C08L39/06, C08L33/26, C08L33/14, C08L33/02, C08L29/10 (US,EP);
A61L31/10, C08L39/06 (US,EP);
A61L31/10, C08L39/08, C08L39/06, C08L33/26, C08L33/14, C08L33/02, C08L29/10 (EP,US);
A61L33/064, C08L39/06 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] |
Former [1984/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildung einer hydrophilen Beschichtung auf einem Substrat | [1988/01] | English: | Method of forming a hydrophilic coating on a substrate | [1984/17] | French: | Procédé de façonnage d'un revêtement hydrophyle sur un substrat | [1984/17] |
Former [1984/17] | Verfahren zur Bildung einer hydraphilen Beschichtung auf einem Substrat | Examination procedure | 14.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/48] | 10.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.1988
25.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE Kudo, Fumio 5-51, 2-chome, Sugeinadazutsumi Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP Opponent's representative Rees, David Christopher Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.1988
25.10.1988
ADMISSIBLE Kudo, Fumio 5-51, 2-chome, Sugeinadazutsumi Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP Opponent's representative Rees, David Christopher Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | 21.11.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.07.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.11.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.03.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/30] | Appeal following opposition | 02.01.1991 | Appeal received No. T0030/91 | 14.03.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.03.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 23.03.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.03.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3023126 (UNDERWOOD WILLIAM F, et al); | [X]US3216983 (SHELANSKI MORRIS V, et al); | [X]US3721640 (WILHEIM H, et al); | [A]US4100309 (MICKLUS MICHAEL J, et al) | by applicant | US3216983 | US4100309 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Sciences and Technology |