EP0078782 - Method for producing foodstuffs from whole cereal grains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maskin AB Plavia Scheelegatan 1 112 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | For all designated states Maskin AB Plavia Scheelegatan 1 S-112 23 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conrad, Ernst Espegarden Gredeby 5 S-370 24 Nättraby / SE | [1983/19] | Representative(s) | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | Inger, Lars Ulf Bosson L + U INGER Patentbyra HB Garvaregatan 12 S-262 00 Ängelholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 82850217.9 | 01.11.1982 | [1983/19] | Priority number, date | SE19810006527 | 04.11.1981 Original published format: SE 8106527 | [1983/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078782 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078782 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/12, A23L1/10, A23L1/31, A21D13/06 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
A21D13/06 (EP);
A23J1/125 (EP);
A23L13/426 (EP);
A23L7/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Nahrungsmitteln aus Vollgetreidekorn | [1983/19] | English: | Method for producing foodstuffs from whole cereal grains | [1983/19] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'aliments à partir de graines de céréales entières | [1983/19] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 03.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL279192 ; | [A]GB1244288 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]); | [AD]FR2406665 (LYCKEBY STAERKELSEFOERAEDLING [SE]) |