EP0091535 - Spectrophotometer with wavelength calibration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1986 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LKB Biochrom Ltd. Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4BH / GB | [1983/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickerson, Peter Michael 19 Batt Lane Cambridge / GB | 02 /
Moult, Stephen Malcolm 15 Dain Tree Needingworth Huntingdon Cambs / GB | 03 /
Waterworth, Peter Holme Fen Drove Colne Huntingdon Cambs / GB | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Sandström, Sven LKB-Produkter AB Box 305 161 26 Bromma / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | Sandström, Sven LKB-Produkter AB Box 305 S-161 26 Bromma / SE | Application number, filing date | 82850250.0 | 03.12.1982 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | SE19810007809 | 28.12.1981 Original published format: SE 8107809 | [1983/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0091535 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0091535 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/28 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
G01J3/12 (EP);
G01J3/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1983/42] | Title | German: | Spektrophotometer mit Wellenlängenkalibrierung | [1983/42] | English: | Spectrophotometer with wavelength calibration | [1983/42] | French: | Spectrophotomètre avec étalonnage en longueur d'ondes | [1983/42] | File destroyed: | 04.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/13] | 11.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.01.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3700331 ; | [A]US3973849 ; | [A]JPS5284755 | [Y] - ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 48, no. 2, February 1976pages 303-311; R.W. SPILLMAN et al.: "Computer-controlled programmable monochromator system with automated wavelength calibration and background correction" | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 145, 25th November 1977page 7387 E 77; & JP 52084755 A (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.)(14-07-1977) |