EP0062028 - Container for liquids, in particular drinks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lehner, Klaus Roseggerstrasse 2 A-4600 Wels / AT | [1982/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/40] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 82890043.1 | 23.03.1982 | [1982/40] | Priority number, date | AT19810001512 | 01.04.1981 Original published format: AT 151281 | [1982/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0062028 | Date: | 06.10.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/40] | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/16 | [1982/40] | CPC: |
A45F3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/40] | Title | German: | Behältnis für Flüssigkeiten, insbesondere Getränke | [1982/40] | English: | Container for liquids, in particular drinks | [1982/40] | French: | Récipient pour liquides, en particulier boissons | [1982/40] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1985/15] | 12.01.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |