EP0069108 - Process and appliance for producing welded grid bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1987 [1987/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVG Entwicklungs- u. Verwertungs- Gesellschaft m.b.H. Vinzenz-Muchitsch-Strasse 36 A-8011 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states EVG Entwicklungs- u. Verwertungs- Gesellschaft m.b.H. Vinzenz-Muchitsch-Strasse 36 A-8011 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Rosengasse 7 A-8042 Graz / AT | 02 /
Ritter, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Peterstalstrasse 157 A-8042 Graz / AT | 03 /
Ritter, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Unterer Plattenweg 47 A-8043 Graz / AT | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Holzer, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Schütz u. Partner Brigittenauer Lände 50 1200 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | Holzer, Walter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schütz und Partner, Fleischmanngasse 9 A-1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 82890061.3 | 29.04.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | AT19810002158 | 14.05.1981 Original published format: AT 215881 | [1983/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0069108 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0069108 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0069108 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/32 | [1983/01] | CPC: |
B23K11/0086 (EP,US);
B21F27/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen geschweisster Gittermatten | [1986/42] | English: | Process and appliance for producing welded grid bodies | [1983/01] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour fabriquer des corps de matelas soudés | [1986/42] |
Former [1983/01] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen geschweisster Gitterkörper | ||
Former [1983/01] | Procédé et dispositif pour fabriquer des corps de treillis soudés | Examination procedure | 21.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/18] | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2177030 (WEISMANN V [US]); | [Y]US3879908 (WEISMANN VICTOR P); | [Y]FR2336994 (CS & M INC [US]); | [Y]DE2843324 (COVINGTON BROS BUILDING SYST); | [YE]US4340802 (ARTZER RICHARD F) |