EP0072367 - Method of measuring the coating thickness of clad wires or pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Österreichisches Forschungszentrum Seibersdorf Ges.m.b.H. Kramergasse 1 A-1010 Wien / AT | [1986/35] |
Former [1983/07] | For all designated states Österreichisches Forschungszentrum Seibersdorf Ges.m.b.H. Kramergasse 1 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frevert, Erich, Dr. Donaustrasse 87/10 A-2344 Maria Enzersdorf / AT | [1983/07] | Application number, filing date | 82890113.2 | 04.08.1982 | [1983/07] | Priority number, date | AT19810003435 | 04.08.1981 Original published format: AT 343581 | [1983/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0072367 | Date: | 16.02.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0072367 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01B15/02 | [1983/07] | CPC: |
G01B15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1983/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Beschichtungsdicke von ummantelten Drähten oder Rohren | [1983/07] | English: | Method of measuring the coating thickness of clad wires or pipes | [1983/07] | French: | Méthode de mesure de l'épaisseur de l'enduit de fils ou de tuyaux enveloppés | [1983/07] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 15.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/17] | 03.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1984 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.1984 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.12.1986 | FR | 17.12.1986 | NL | 17.12.1986 | CH | 31.08.1987 | LI | 31.08.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/25] | BE | 17.12.1986 | |
NL | 17.12.1986 | ||
CH | 31.08.1987 | ||
LI | 31.08.1987 | ||
Former [1988/42] | BE | 17.12.1986 | |
NL | 17.12.1986 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 17.12.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1818231U (DB BUNDESBAHN ZENTRALAMT [DE]); | [A]DE2121601 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]DE2311623 (HELMUT FISCHER GMBH & CO); | [AD]DE2611411 | Examination | DE2549735 | US4129778 |