EP0080453 - Circular loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenzing Aktiengesellschaft A-4860 Lenzing / AT | [1985/42] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states Chemiefaser Lenzing Aktiengesellschaft A-4860 Lenzing / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plammer, Alfred Promenade 13 A-4863 Seewalchen / AT | 02 /
Weiss, Hermann Arnbruckerstrasse 16 A-4860 Lenzing / AT | 03 /
Schachinger, Adolf Stelzhamerstrasse 13/6 A-4850 Timelkam / AT | 04 /
Schönberger, Johann Stelzhamerstrasse 34 A-4850 Timelkam / AT | 05 /
Bloo, Johann Maria Theresiastrasse 49 Rosenau A-4863 Seewalchen / AT | 06 /
Mistlberger, Bruno, Dr. Hamburgerstrasse 5 A-4840 Vöcklabruck / AT | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Wolfram, Gustav Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Wolfram, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram, Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 82890139.7 | 30.09.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | AT19810005064 | 25.11.1981 Original published format: AT 506481 | [1983/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0080453 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0080453 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0080453 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D03D37/00 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
D03D37/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/22] | Title | German: | Rundwebmaschine | [1983/22] | English: | Circular loom | [1983/22] | French: | Métier à tisser circulaire | [1983/22] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 28.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2415569 ; | [AD]US1720151 (CLAUDE SERY); | [AD]AT363873B (TORII WINDING MACHINE CO [JP]) |