EP0089953 - FASTENING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMPOSITE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 Mail Stop 7E-25 Seattle Washington 98124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, Glenn Oliver 108 North 67 Street Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 02 /
THOMSON, Leland Edward 26631 127th Avenue Southeast Kent WA 98031 / US | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 82900055.3 | 30.09.1981 | [1983/40] | WO1981US01318 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301345 | Date: | 14.04.1983 | [1983/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0089953 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0089953 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/30 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
H01R4/30 (EP);
H01R4/64 (EP);
H01R9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1983/40] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR KOMPOSITSTRUKTUREN | [1983/40] | English: | FASTENING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COMPOSITE STRUCTURES | [1983/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE FIXATION POUR DES STRUCTURES COMPOSITES | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1983 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1983 | Search fee paid | 06.05.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 27.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.06.1988 | [1989/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1020782 ; | [Y]DE2651262 ; | [Y]DE2134605 ; | [A]FR1083447 ; | [A]FR2265194 ; | [A]US4110904 ; | [A]US2990533 | International search | [A]US3969815 ; | [A]GB160218 | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Volume 20, No. 1, published June 1977 |