EP0065980 - ORBITAL MOVEMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1983 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONCEPT ENGINEERING INC. 1800 Center Park Road Lincoln, NB 68502 / US | [1982/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESCHWENDER, Robert C. 1800 Center Park Road Lincoln, NB / US | [1982/49] | Application number, filing date | 82900206.2 | 02.12.1981 | [1982/49] | WO1981US01595 | Priority number, date | US19800212615 | 03.12.1980 Original published format: US 212615 | [1982/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201923 | Date: | 10.06.1982 | [1982/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0065980 | Date: | 08.12.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/49] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/28, B24B23/00 | [1982/49] | CPC: |
B24B23/04 (EP);
F16H1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER UMLAUFBEWEGUNG | [1982/49] | English: | ORBITAL MOVEMENT APPARATUS | [1982/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF A MOUVEMENT ORBITAL | [1982/49] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/21] | 10.02.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.1982 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 06.09.1982 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 06.09.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 06.09.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 06.09.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 06.09.1982 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 06.09.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 06.09.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2042674 ; | [A]US1876954 ; | [A]US1089181 ; | [A]US1844471 ; | [A]US1862220 ; | [A]US3145585 ; | [A]US3975973 ; | [A]US3710645 ; | [A]US2038352 ; | [A]US2395537 ; | [A]US1981046 ; | [A]US1960447 ; | [A]US2683336 ; | [X]FR1067385 ; | [A]FR1085718 ; | [A]DE1933131 |