EP0098262 - ELECTRICAL COUPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.1984 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.1984 [1984/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAYES, Derek Home Farm Cottage St. Michael Bungay Suffolk NR35 1NF / GB | [1984/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/03] | Application number, filing date | 82900214.6 | 12.01.1982 | [1984/03] | WO1982GB00005 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302531 | Date: | 21.07.1983 | [1983/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098262 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/03] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
H01R4/2404 (EP,US);
H01R13/56 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R24/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE KUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG | [1984/03] | English: | ELECTRICAL COUPLING DEVICE | [1984/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPLAGE ELECTRIQUE | [1984/03] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/26] | 11.01.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.10.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 12.10.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 12.10.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 12.10.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.01.1984 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XE]GB2080638 (HAYES DEREK); | [Y]DE2645143 (HAYES DEREK); | [Y]DE2507130 (AMACHER HANS); | [A]GB2077049 (HAYES DEREK); | [A]US3320385 (SHERWOOD HENRY A); | [A]US2964727 (HEBELER EDWARD S); | [A]US3177458 (BUCHANAN STEPHEN N) |