EP0067209 - RECOVERY OF CHLORINATED POLY(VINYL CHLORIDE) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron Ohio 44318 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44318 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, Alan James 2050 Berkeley Drive Westlake, OH 44145 / US | 02 /
VIELHABER, Robert Gerard 98 Homan Drive Doylestown, OH 44230 / US | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1982/51] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 82900440.7 | 16.12.1981 | [1982/51] | WO1981US01675 | Priority number, date | US19800219650 | 24.12.1980 Original published format: US 219650 | [1982/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202205 | Date: | 08.07.1982 | [1982/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0067209 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067209 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/00, C08F8/22 | [1982/51] | CPC: |
C08F6/12 (EP,US);
C08F8/22 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/22, C08F114/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/51] | Title | German: | GEWINNUNG CHLORIERTEN POLY(VINYLCHLORIDS) | [1982/51] | English: | RECOVERY OF CHLORINATED POLY(VINYL CHLORIDE) | [1982/51] | French: | PROCEDE D'OBTENTION DE CHLORURE DE POLYVINYLE CHLORE | [1982/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1982 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.1982 | Search fee paid | 20.08.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/10] | 07.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.08.1986 | SE | 31.08.1986 | [1989/16] |
Former [1988/04] | BE | 20.08.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1093850 [ ] (ICI LTD) | International search | [X]US2481188 (BABAYAN VIGEN K); | [X]US2571901 (EARL LAWLOR FRANCIS); | [X]US3062795 (CAIN WILLIAM P, et al) |