EP0069760 - AN OPTICAL COMMUNICATION ARRANGEMENT FOR REDUCING HARMONIC DISTORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1983/10] |
Former [1983/03] | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, N.Y. 10038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRILEY, Bruce Edwin 5650 S. Madison Avenue Countryside, IL 60525 / US | [1983/03] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies Inc., 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/03] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 82900452.2 | 18.12.1981 | [1983/03] | WO1981US01688 | Priority number, date | US19810225514 | 16.01.1981 Original published format: US 225514 | [1983/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202632 | Date: | 05.08.1982 | [1982/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0069760 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H04B9/00 | [1983/03] | CPC: |
H04B10/502 (EP,US);
H04B10/564 (EP,US);
H04B10/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/03] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR VERMINDERUNG HARMONISCHER VERZERRUNG | [1983/03] | English: | AN OPTICAL COMMUNICATION ARRANGEMENT FOR REDUCING HARMONIC DISTORTION | [1983/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE POUR LA REDUCTION DE LA DISTORSION HARMONIQUE | [1983/03] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1982 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1982 | Search fee paid | 07.09.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/12] | 08.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/25] | 01.03.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2485837 [ ] (SEFTIM SARL [FR]) | International search | [A]US3467858 (BURNETT THOMAS BRIAN); | [A]US3953727 (D AURIA LUIGI, et al); | [A]US4054834 (BOIRAT ROBERT, et al); | [A]JPS5593338 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |