EP0077332 - PULSE WIDTH MODULATION DECODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. Executive Office 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/17] | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. Executive Office 2500 Harbor Boulevard Box 3100 Fullerton California 92634 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOELLER, Roy P. 1318 Terrace Avenue 4, Hayward, CA / US | [1983/17] | Application number, filing date | 82900524.8 | 28.12.1981 | [1983/17] | WO1981US01757 | Priority number, date | US19800220689 | 29.12.1980 Original published format: US 220689 | [1983/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202300 | Date: | 08.07.1982 | [1982/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0077332 | Date: | 27.04.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/17] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | H03K9/08 | [1983/17] | CPC: |
H03K9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/17] | Title | German: | PULSBREITEN-MODULATIONSDEKODER | [1983/26] | English: | PULSE WIDTH MODULATION DECODER | [1983/17] | French: | DECODEUR DE MODULATION DE LARGEUR D'IMPULSION | [1983/17] |
Former [1983/17] | DEKODIERER FÜR BREITENMODULIERTE IMPULSE | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/31] | 18.04.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.1982 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 29.09.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 29.09.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 29.09.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3597693 ; | [A]US3624529 ; | [A]US3886463 ; | [A]US3571736 ; | [AP]US4249136 ; | [A]SU589689 |