EP0070302 - TEMPERATURE REGULATION SYSTEM FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1988 [1988/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DREXEL INDUSTRIES, INC. Maple Avenue Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [1983/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONATO, Guido A. 655 Mallard Road Wayne, PA 19087 / US | 02 /
HAMMOND, Edwin Ernest 4 Driftwood Drive Norristown, PA 19403 / US | 03 /
MULLOWNEY, Robert A. 221 Duffield Street Willow Grove, PA 19090 / US | [1983/04] | Representative(s) | Santarelli, et al Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Rinuy, Santarelli, et al 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1983/04] | Rinuy, Guy Cabinet Rinuy et Santarelli 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82900719.4 | 18.01.1982 | [1983/04] | WO1982US00050 | Priority number, date | US19810225715 | 16.01.1981 Original published format: US 225715 | [1983/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8202520 | Date: | 05.08.1982 | [1982/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0070302 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0070302 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/16, B60L11/18 | [1983/04] | CPC: |
B60H1/00392 (EP,US);
B60H1/00271 (EP,US);
B66F9/07595 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1983/04] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRISCHE FAHRZEUGE | [1983/04] | English: | TEMPERATURE REGULATION SYSTEM FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLES | [1983/04] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE LA TEMPERATURE POUR DES VEHICULES ELECTRIQUES | [1983/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1982 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1982 | Search fee paid | 27.09.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1982 | Examination requested [1983/04] | 25.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1986 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4026349 (SCHAAP ROBERT E); | [A]US3451469 (HALL LESLIE, et al); | [A]US3032324 (FIALA ERNST J H); | [A]US4087776 (DONATO GUIDO A); | [A]US3965971 (ROGGENKAMP GEORGE H) |