EP0085679 - SPACE FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALLEN, Ronald Lee 50 Pilkington Street Rockhampton North, Qld. 4701 / AU | For all designated states WALLEN, Leonie Ruth 50 Pilkington Street Rockhampton North, Qld. 4701 / AU | [1983/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLEN, Ronald Lee 50 Pilkington Street Rockhampton North, Qld. 4701 / AU | [1983/33] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82900780.6 | 19.03.1982 | [1983/33] | WO1982AU00036 | Priority number, date | AU19810008076 | 20.03.1981 Original published format: AU 807681 | AU19810008958 | 20.05.1981 Original published format: AU 895881 | [1983/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203236 | Date: | 30.09.1982 | [1982/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085679 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/19, E04B7/10, E04B7/14 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
E04B1/19 (EP);
E04B2001/193 (EP);
E04B2001/1936 (EP);
E04B2001/1951 (EP);
E04B2001/1963 (EP);
E04B2001/1975 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1984/06] |
Former [1983/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | RÄUMLICHE RAHMEN | [1983/33] | English: | SPACE FRAMES | [1983/33] | French: | CADRES D'ESPACES | [1983/33] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1983 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.1983 | Search fee paid | 20.04.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1982 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 23.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LU, NL | 03.11.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/27] | 05.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.05.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 20.05.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 20.05.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 20.05.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 20.05.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3415027 [ ]; | GB1175711 [ ]; | FR2230816 [ ]; | US3425182 [ ]; | GB1443851 [ ]; | FR2286249 [ ] | International search | [A]US3477189 ; | [A]US3336718 ; | [A]US2284898 ; | [AP]WO8200311 |