EP0073838 - COPOLYMERIZED POLYAMIDE RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.01.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1992 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARITA, Koichiro 6-2, Kitashinzaike 1-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken 670 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Hajime 500, Kamiyobe Yobe-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken 671-12 / JP | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82900827.5 | 16.03.1982 | [1983/11] | WO1982JP00068 | Priority number, date | JP19810038374 | 16.03.1981 Original published format: JP 3837481 | JP19810102047 | 30.06.1981 Original published format: JP 10204781 | JP19820036910 | 09.03.1982 Original published format: JP 3691082 | [1983/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203219 | Date: | 30.09.1982 | [1982/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073838 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073838 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0073838 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/02, C08G69/44, C08G81/00 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
C08G69/00 (EP,US);
C08G69/44 (EP,US);
C08G69/48 (EP,US);
C08G81/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1983/11] | Title | German: | KOPOLYMERISIERTES POLYAMIDHARZ | [1983/11] | English: | COPOLYMERIZED POLYAMIDE RESIN | [1983/11] | French: | RESINE POLYAMIDE COPOLYMERISEE | [1983/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1982 | Translation filed | 06.10.1982 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1982 | Search fee paid | 06.10.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/11] | 17.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.1989
12.05.1989
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.04.1989
12.05.1989
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 17.05.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 24.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.06.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 20.12.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS5431497 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPS4512150B ; | [A]JPS465474B ; | [A]JPS5580435 (MONSANTO CO); | [A]JPS4212546B ; | [A]US3373223 (ARMSTRONG ROBERT G) |