EP0075601 - TIME-SHARING COMMUNICATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1989 [1989/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Susumu 1-8-17, Fujigaya Kugenuma Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251 / JP | [1983/14] | Representative(s) | Muir, Ian Robertson, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/14] | Muir, Ian R., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82901002.4 | 01.04.1982 | [1983/14] | WO1982JP00094 | Priority number, date | JP19810052167 | 07.04.1981 Original published format: JP 5216781 | JP19810096313 | 22.06.1981 Original published format: JP 9631381 | JP19810149962 | 22.09.1981 Original published format: JP 14996281 | JP19810183367 | 16.11.1981 Original published format: JP 18336781 | JP19810204030 | 17.12.1981 Original published format: JP 20403081 | JP19810211151 | 28.12.1981 Original published format: JP 21115181 | [1983/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203515 | Date: | 14.10.1982 | [1982/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075601 | Date: | 06.04.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075601 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H04J4/00, H04J3/00, H04L27/20, H04B7/155 | [1983/14] | CPC: |
H04J3/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/14] | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENSYSTEM MIT ZEITLICH GESCHACHTELTER ARBEITSWEISE | [1983/14] | English: | TIME-SHARING COMMUNICATING SYSTEM | [1983/14] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION A TEMPS PARTAGE | [1983/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.1982 | Translation filed | 21.12.1982 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1982 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1982 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1982 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/14] | 14.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XE]EP0056277 (NEC CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5598064U | Examination | JPS5598064U | - WISSENSCHAFTLICHEN BERICHTE AEG-TELEFUNKEN, vol. 51, no. 4/5, April/Mai 1978, BERLIN (DE); S.Börner: "Modems für Digitalübertragung im Burstbetrieb über Nachrichtensatelliten", page 214, 215. | - ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, vol. 55-B, no. 6, June 1972, WASHINGTON (US); T. Okamoto et al.: "Design and performance of the carrier-pulse transmission system with the approximate zero-crossing waveform", page 47-55. |