EP0075004 - SILICONE METHACRYLATE HYDROGELS FOR CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.1983 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McCARRY, John D. 12650 Westminster Avenue Santa Ana, CA 92706-2100 / US | [1983/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLEY, William M., Jr. 2551 Sleepy Hollow Drive Glendale, CA 91206 / US | [1983/13] | Application number, filing date | 82901265.7 | 23.03.1982 | [1983/13] | WO1982US00352 | Priority number, date | US19810246956 | 24.03.1981 Original published format: US 246956 | [1983/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8203397 | Date: | 14.10.1982 | [1982/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075004 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/13] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C08F230/08 | [1983/13] | CPC: |
C08F30/08 (EP);
G02B1/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L43/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/13] | Title | German: | SILIKON-METHACRYLAT-HYDROGELE FÜR KONTAKTLINSEN | [1983/13] | English: | SILICONE METHACRYLATE HYDROGELS FOR CONTACT LENSES | [1983/13] | French: | HYDROGELS DE METHACRYLATE DE SILICONE POUR DES VERRES DE CONTACT | [1983/13] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 29.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/36] | 30.05.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.12.1982 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.04.1983 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4182822 ; | [X]US4242483 ; | [X]US4246389 ; | [XP]US4306042 |