Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8207974 | 04.10.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US8200384 | 01.04.1982 | US32188481 | 16.11.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE8237135U | 24.11.1983 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US8200384 | 01.04.1982 | US32188481 | 16.11.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2121592 | 21.12.1983 | A | GB8317984D0 | 03.08.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US8200384 | 01.04.1982 | US32188481 | 16.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8301860 | Global Dossier | 26.05.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32188481 | 16.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0093711 | Global Dossier | 27.04.1984 | A4 | EP0093711 | 16.11.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32188481 | 16.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS58501877 | 04.11.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US32188481 | 16.11.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4376294 | 08.03.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US32188481 | 16.11.1981 |