EP0093711 - MAGNETIC HEAD LOADING AND RETRACTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DMA SYSTEMS CORPORATION 325 Chapala Street Santa Barbara, CA 93101 / US | [1983/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Markus 5415 Cameo Road Carpinteria, CA 93013 / US | 02 /
SUTTON, David A. 1148 Oak Glen Road Santa Ynez, CA 93460 / US | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1983/48] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Am Ruhrstein 1 D-45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1983/46] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Am Ruhrstein 1 D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82901278.0 | 01.04.1982 | [1983/46] | WO1982US00384 | Priority number, date | US19810321884 | 16.11.1981 Original published format: US 321884 | [1983/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301860 | Date: | 26.05.1983 | [1983/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093711 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/54, G11B21/22 | [1983/46] | CPC: |
G11B5/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1983/46] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM ZUSTELLEN UND ZURÜCKZIEHEN VON MAGNETKÖPFEN | [1983/46] | English: | MAGNETIC HEAD LOADING AND RETRACTION APPARATUS | [1983/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGEMENT ET DE RETRACTION DE TETES MAGNETIQUES | [1983/46] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1983 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1983 | Search fee paid | 06.08.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 02.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/11] | 15.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5359408 ; | [A]JP5564666 ; | [A]US3864748 (HERDMAN CRAIG T, et al); | [A]US3914792 (BEECROFT HAROLD JAMES); | [E]WO8201439 (NEW WORLD COMPUTER CO INC [US]) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 94, August 5, 1978, page 4503 E 78 & JP - A - 53 59 408 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) (May 29, 1978), & JP5359408 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 107 (P-21) (589), July 31, 1980, page 94 P 21 & JP - A - 55 64 666 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) (May 15, 1980), & JP5564666 A 00000000 | International search | [X]US4120010 (MITSUYA YASUNAGA, et al); | [X]US4209813 (BRYER PHILIP S [US]); | [X]US4247877 (KELLER JACOB P, et al); | [X]US4253125 (KANAMULLER FRANK X); | [XP]US4302789 (VOS LEROY A); | [XP]US4309732 (KRONFELD LEONARD E, et al); | [XP]US4315292 (KRONFELD LEONARD E) |