EP0083595 - THERMAL INSULATION CURTAIN FOR WINDOWS, DOORS AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/29] | THERMAL INSULATION DEVICE FOR WINDOWS, DOORS AND THE LIKE | ||
[1985/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/29] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRILL, Klaus Neuhaldenstrasse 24 D-7015 Korntal / DE | 02 /
GROTHE, Wolfgang Talstrasse 19 D-7531 Tiefenbronn / DE | [1983/29] | Application number, filing date | 82901292.1 | 01.04.1982 | [1983/29] | WO1982DE00077 | Priority number, date | DE19813128487 | 18.07.1981 Original published format: DE 3128487 | [1983/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8300280 | Date: | 03.02.1983 | [1983/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0083595 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083595 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A47H13/14, A47H23/00 | [1983/29] | CPC: |
A47H23/00 (EP,US);
A47H13/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/29] | Title | German: | WÄRMEDÄMMVORHANG FÜR FENSTER, TÜREN UND DERGLEICHEN | [1985/32] | English: | THERMAL INSULATION CURTAIN FOR WINDOWS, DOORS AND THE LIKE | [1985/32] | French: | RIDEAU D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE POUR FENETRES, PORTES ET ANALOGUES | [1985/32] |
Former [1983/29] | WÄRMEDÄMMANDORDNUNG FÜR FENSTER, TÜREN UND DERGLEICHEN | ||
Former [1983/29] | THERMAL INSULATION DEVICE FOR WINDOWS, DOORS AND THE LIKE | ||
Former [1983/29] | DISPOSITIF D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE POUR FENETRES, PORTES ET ANALOGUES | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1983 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/29] | 10.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2155376 (JOHNSON SAMUEL J); | [X]CH244002 (BALATUM NV [NL]); | [A]US2747252 (FRY GENEVA K); | [X]US3775235 (HOWELL M); | [X]FR2236453 (SATO RIUNOSUKE [JP]); | [A]US3974946 (GENTRY PAT) | Examination | EP0049418 |