EP0105252 - FLOOR CONSOLE WITH LATCHABLE SLIDING TRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
Former [1984/16] | For:BE
CH
LI
LU
NL
SE
Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATHIRIA, Shabbir A. 38340 Cottonwood Drive Sterling Heights, MI 48077 / US | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 82901390.3 | 26.03.1982 | [1984/16] | WO1982US00372 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303392 | Date: | 13.10.1983 | [1983/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0105252 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105252 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B60R7/04 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
B60N3/102 (EP);
B60N2/793 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/38] |
Former [1984/16] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | BODENKONSOLE MIT VERRIEGELBARER UND GLEITENDER TAFEL | [1984/16] | English: | FLOOR CONSOLE WITH LATCHABLE SLIDING TRAY | [1984/16] | French: | CONSOLE DE PLANCHER AVEC PLATEAU COULISSANT ET VERROUILLABLE | [1984/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1983 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1983 | Search fee paid | 30.11.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/16] | 29.02.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, LU, NL, SE | 30.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.12.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4262962 ; | [A]US3497076 ; | [A]US3215467 ; | [A]US3356409 ; | [A]US4146159 ; | [A]US3804233 ; | [A]US3561589 ; | [A]US3163287 |