EP0093173 - HIGH FREQUENCY HEATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Akihiko 380-1, Oaza Shimomaki Kanmakicho Kitakatsuragigun Nara-ken 639-02 / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Kiyoshige 1323, Toriyacho Kashihara-shi Nara-ken 634 / JP | 03 /
AKIYOSHI, Mitsuo 540-6, Shichijyocho Nara-shi Nara-ken 630 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Kenji 376, Tsutsuicho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken 639-11 / JP | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [1983/45] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 82901429.9 | 13.05.1982 | [1983/45] | WO1982JP00165 | Priority number, date | JP19810178832 | 06.11.1981 Original published format: JP 17883281 | [1983/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301675 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | [1983/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093173 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, H05B6/68 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
H05B6/6405 (EP);
H05B6/642 (EP);
H05B6/645 (EP);
H05B6/6458 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1983/45] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZ-HEIZVORRICHTUNG | [1983/45] | English: | HIGH FREQUENCY HEATING DEVICE | [1983/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE A HAUTE FREQUENCE | [1983/45] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1983 | Translation filed | 06.07.1983 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.1983 | Search fee paid | 06.07.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/45] | 19.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/38] | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2706367 ; | [Y]EP0033520 ; | [A]EP0000959 ; | [A]FR2312067 ; | [A]EP0013030 ; | [A]EP0031156 | International search | [Y]JPS5483148 ; | [A]JPS5369940 | [Y] - National Technical Report, Vol. 26, No. 3 (June 1980) Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd., TERADA JIRO and Three Others "Takino Sensor "Ceramic Ondo.Shitsudo Sensor" "Humiserum II"", p. 433-441 |